UDG Management, LLC et al v. Ironshore Indemnity Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02777 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441nr Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ironshore Indemnity Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Eun Mee Baek
|
|
Plaintiff
Jina Baek
|
|
Plaintiff
ED Edison Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeong Hoon Kim
|
|
Plaintiff
UDG Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
UDG Management, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 5:21 PM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case will be remanded to New York Supreme Court on May 1, 2024, unless before that date the Defendant seeks permission to take jurisdictional discovery, Gualandi v. Adams, 385 F.3d 236, 244 (2d Cir. 2004), or submits new affidavits that adequately demonstrate the basis for this Court's jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2024) (jca) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Tue 04/23 5:58 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Eridania Perez-Jaquez to RE-FILE Document 10 Affidavit in Support. Use the event type Declaration (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers, then link to 5 Order to Show Cause. (db) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Mon 04/22 4:47 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT of Eridania Perez in Support re:1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) Modified on 4/23/2024 (db) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit West Law Public Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Public Records Search | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Mon 04/22 4:02 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Eridania Perez in Support re:1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) Modified on 4/23/2024 (db) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit West Law Public Record | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 2:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of the Complaint . . Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/19 2:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of the Complaint . Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
6 | 6
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/19 7:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/16 10:15 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by no later than Monday, April 22, 2024, Defendant must file an affidavit that establishes that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction or the case will be remanded to New York Supreme Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/15/24) (yv) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 10:46 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 10:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 10:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eridania Perez-Jaquez on behalf of Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 11:35 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ironshore Holding (U.S.) Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Ironshore Indemnity Corp.. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 11:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651309/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29210264).Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Corp...(Perez-Jaquez, Eridania) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit S&C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Kim search, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Baek search |