K. v. Rigueur
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Naomi Reice Buchwald |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02778 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331pi Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey Rigueur
3 York Drive
Wyandanch, NY 11798 |
|
Plaintiff
C. K.
23 West 73rd Street Suite 102
New York, NY 10023 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 12:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Jeffrey Rigueur served on 4/23/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe. Document filed by C. K...(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 6:02 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff may proceed under a pseudonym and that all parties refer to plaintiff as C.K. in all filings, and may not otherwise publicly identify plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/17/2024) (ks) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 11:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Rigueur..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 11:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Simon Hahn Szalkiewicz to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not properly signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 11:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Simon Hahn Szalkiewicz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 11:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 11:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 11:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 10:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JEFFREY RIGUEUR a/k/a JEFFREY R. WING, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by C. K...(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Protective Order
Fri 04/12 10:18 AM
MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by C. K.. Return Date set for 5/10/2024 at 09:30 AM..(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit C.K. Certification | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 10:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Rigueur. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29210316)Document filed by C. K...(Szalkiewicz, Daniel) |