Hagins v. Carrington Mortgage LLC et al
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard E Myers, II |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00217 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carrington Mortgage LLC
|
|
Defendant
Shannon Mitchell
|
|
Plaintiff
Marquita Hagins
222 Trailing Oak Trail
Clayton, NC 27527 |
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 3:00 PM
ORDER regarding 1 Complaint and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marquita Hagins. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents no later than May 1, 2024. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 4/16/2024. (Copy of order and forms mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 04/12 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Fri 04/12 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Marquita Hagins. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 7:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (short form), filed by Marquita Hagins. (Rudd, D.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 7:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage LLC, Shannon Mitchell, filed by Marquita Hagins. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |