Cohan v. BKB Coral Springs, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Smith |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60583 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
BKB Coral Springs, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
8
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Tue 04/16 4:05 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/7/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 12:36 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. BKB Coral Springs, LLC served on 4/15/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 12:04 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 1:15 PM
Summons Issued as to BKB Coral Springs, LLC. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 1:13 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT against BKB Coral Springs, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17443518, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |