Cohan v. Quality Drive-In I, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60584 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 12:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Quality Drive-In I, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/19 12:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 04/18 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Quality Drive-In I, LLC. Attorney Sarah Kuehnel added to party Quality Drive-In I, LLC(pty:dft).(Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Thu 04/18 12:54 PM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Pacer Search | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 04/17 1:07 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 04/17 1:05 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Plaintiff's counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court the verified statement responding to the questions promulgated in this Order on or before April 19, 2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 4:34 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. Quality Drive-In I, LLC served on 4/15/2024, response/answer due 5/6/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 12:09 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Quality Drive-In I, LLC. (caw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 3:23 PM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Quality Drive-In I, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17443574, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |