Oakland County Water Resources Commissioner et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul D Borman |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10966 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Sixth Circuit Court in Oakland Count, No. 24-206083-CK |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Lexington Insurance Company
99 High St, Floor 25
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evergreen Farmington Sewage Disposal System
One Pub Works Building #95W
Waterford, MI 48328 |
|
Plaintiff
Evergreen-Farmington Sanitary Drain Drainage District
One Pub Works Building #95W
Waterford, MI 48328 |
|
Plaintiff
Oakland County Water Resources Commissioner, Jim Nash, County Agency
One Pub Works Building #95W
Waterford, MI 48328 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 9:33 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, (Plaintiffs' Complaint) ,1 Notice of Removal, Lexington Insurance Company answer due 5/3/2024.. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DAll) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 4:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David T. Brown appearing on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company (Brown, David) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/18 4:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, (Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Lexington Insurance Company. (Yombor, Kevin) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lexington Insurance Company from Sixth Circuit Court in Oakland County, case number 2024-206083-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9749638 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Yombor, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 04/12 1:38 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TTho) |