DellaRocco v. Long Island Railroad Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02786 |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Cause | 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Long Island Railroad Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig DellaRocco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 1:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Document filed by Craig DellaRocco..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 12:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company..(jgo) |
|
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Mon 04/15 11:36 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-02786, filed on 4/10/2024. (sgz) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 12:21 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 12:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 12:23 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 12:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 12:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Craig DellaRocco..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29211801)Document filed by Craig DellaRocco..(Wietzke, Marc) |