Rodriguez v. Citibank, N.A.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew G Schopler |
Referred: | Michael S Berg |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00670 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1601 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 11:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Citibank, N.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alfredo Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 10:15 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn) (anh) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Citibank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18753488.), filed by Alfredo Rodriguez. The new case number is 3:24-cv-670-AGS-MSB. Judge Andrew G. Schopler and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Nicholas Barthel)(stn) (anh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |