Orlando Health, Inc. v. HKS ARCHITECTS, INC.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00693 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
HKS ARCHITECTS, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Orlando Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of service
Thu 04/25 11:48 AM
SUMMONS returned executed on 4/23/2024 by Orlando Health, Inc. as to HKS Architects, Inc. (Springhart, Jeremy) (Modified on 4/25/2024, to edit text) (BGR) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/17 10:45 AM
SUMMONS issued as to HKS Architects, Inc. (ELM) |
|
7 | 7
order
Interested Persons Order
Wed 04/17 8:45 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/17/2024. (KLD) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proposed summons
Tue 04/16 12:22 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Orlando Health, Inc.. (Springhart, Jeremy) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 10:58 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Orlando Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Orlando Health, Inc. for Orlando Health, Inc... (Springhart, Jeremy) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/16 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeremy Trace Springhart on behalf of Orlando Health, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jeremy Springhart. (Springhart, Jeremy) |
|
misc
Disbursement Voucher / Refund
Tue 04/16 3:25 PM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21977508 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to Jeremy Springhart.. (NLC) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeremy Trace Springhart of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 2:18 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-693-JA-LHP. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:04 PM
COMPLAINT against HKS ARCHITECTS, INC. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21977635) filed by Orlando Health, Inc..(Springhart, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 |