Hernandez v. Wakefield & Associates, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00897 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wakefield & Associates, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Cesar Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 05/02 2:09 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04.23.24 by Cesar Hernandez as to Wakefield & Associates, LLC. (Swift, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 05/02 2:08 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04.23.24 by Cesar Hernandez as to Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC. (Swift, Aaron) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/26 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joshua Robert Jacobson on behalf of Cesar Hernandez. Lead Counsel: Joshua R. Jacobson. (Jacobson, Joshua) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 04/15 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Mon 04/15 9:16 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC, Wakefield & Associates, LLC. (EVK) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 2:24 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-897-WFJ-NHA. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC, Wakefield & Associates, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21977390) filed by Cesar Hernandez.(Swift, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |