Cohan v. 9550 Sample Holdings, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Smith |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60587 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
9550 Sample Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 9:34 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. 9550 Sample Holdings, LLC served on 4/25/2024, response/answer due 5/16/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 12:20 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 2:37 PM
Summons Issued as to 9550 Sample Holdings, LLC. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 04/12 2:35 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against 9550 Sample Holdings, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17443950, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |