Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00382
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Case in other court:Kent County Circuit Court, 24-02401-CH
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 5:07 AM EDT
defendant
Walker, City of
Represented By
Michael S. Bogren
Plunkett Cooney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Charles L. Bogren
Plunkett Cooney (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC
Represented By
Michael P. Hindelang
Honigman Llp (detroit)
contact info
Laura Biery
Honigman Llp (detroit)
contact info
Brandon John Wilson
Honigman Llp (detroit)
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
14 14 misc Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand Thu 06/13 1:41 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Kent County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Re Order of Remand Fri 05/31 8:49 AM
LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Kent County Circuit Court (ems)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/30 10:10 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION11 ; remanding case to the Kent County Circuit Court; dismissing as moot motion to remand7 ; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 05/30 3:28 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Remand by plaintiff Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC (Wilson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/29 8:52 AM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to remand 7 filed by Walker, City of (Bogren, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
9 9 order Notice Cancelling Hearing Mon 05/13 9:07 AM
NOTICE adjourning without date 5/30/2024 Rule 16 scheduling conference (rmw)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Mon 05/13 9:05 AM
ORDER: Defendant's response to motion7 due not later than 5/28/2024; notice to issue; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
7 7 motion Remand Fri 05/10 1:16 PM
MOTION to remand by plaintiff Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC; (Wilson, Brandon) Modified text on 5/10/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Service
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 04/23 11:58 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/30/2024 at 01:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 5/23/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/22 1:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC (Wilson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/22 1:47 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brandon John Wilson on behalf of plaintiff Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC (Wilson, Brandon)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/22 1:57 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael P. Hindelang on behalf of plaintiff Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC (Hindelang, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/22 2:00 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura Biery on behalf of plaintiff Jade Pig Ventures - River Ridge LLC (Biery, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) Fri 04/19 1:21 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Walker, City of (Bogren, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/15 8:52 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 04/12 2:19 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (ems)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/12 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 24-02401 CH filed by Walker, City of (Bogren, Charles) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Summons,
Att: 2 State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Notice of Filing Removal to KCCC,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 04/12 1:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendant Walker, City of in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7345513 (Bogren, Charles)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendant Walker, City of (Bogren, Michael)
Related: [-]