Board of Managers of London Terrace Towers Condominium v. United States Postal Service et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Referred: | Barbara C Moses |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02788 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal - Suit against Federal Officer |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
United States Postal Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XYZ Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Managers of London Terrace Towers Condominium
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/24 4:41 PM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/24/2024) (vfr) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Postal Service answer due 6/3/2024. (vfr) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 04/23 10:08 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Mollie Kornreich dated April 23, 2024. Document filed by United States Postal Service..(Kornreich, Mollie) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 4:38 PM
ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery (but excluding motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, for injunctive relief, for summary judgment, or for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23) must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. Parties and counsel are cautioned: (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/18/2024) (va) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 3:38 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/16/2024) (ks) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 12:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 12:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 12:41 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 3:20 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Board of Managers of London Terrace Towers Condominium; amending1 Notice of Removal.Document filed by United States Postal Service. Related document:1 Notice of Removal..(Kornreich, Mollie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 1:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornreich, Mollie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 850046/2024..Document filed by United States Postal Service..(Kornreich, Mollie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |