v. Taylor
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Case #: | 2:24-mc-00011 |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 05/01 2:36 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to2 Order to Show Cause (Attorney Discipline) sent to John Taylor, date delivered 4/29/2024. (er) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause (Attorney Discipline)
Tue 04/23 12:26 PM
ORDER directing Respondent to show cause within 30 days after service of this Order why this Court should not impose the identical discipline imposed heretofore by the Supreme Court of Ohio. Respondent shall not represent any person in this Court until final resolution of this matter. Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/22/2024. (er) |
|
Att: 1 Supreme Court of Ohio Order | ||
1 | 1
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause (Attorney Discipline)
Mon 04/22 11:28 AM
ORDER directing Respondent to show cause within 30 days after service of this Order why this Court should not impose the identical discipline imposed heretofore by the Supreme Court of Ohio. Respondent shall not represent any person in this Court until final resolution of this matter. Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 4/22/2024. (er) |
|
Att: 1 Supreme Court of Ohio Order |