Moyer v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mustafa T Kasubhai |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00631 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 4:55 PM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (le) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/25 12:34 PM
Notice of Appearance of Franco L. Becia appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Wed 04/17 12:03 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: A review of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) reveals Plaintiff is unable to afford the costs of this litigation. See ECF No.2 . Moreover, a review of Plaintiff's Complaint1 demonstrates that Plaintiff does not bring a frivolous or malicious case, or fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) . Accordingly, Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP2 is GRANTED. (jk) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
4 - Social Security Procedural Order FORM EVENT
Mon 04/15 2:58 PM
Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (le) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/12 11:51 AM
Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration . Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Fri 04/12 9:37 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Khadija Moyer. (Manning, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Fri 04/12 9:35 AM
Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected) . Plaintiff consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge Prior case number: 6:21-cv-01451-AA. Filed by Khadija Moyer against Commissioner Social Security Administration Social Security Answer is due by 8/12/2024.. (Manning, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |