Carlos D v. O'Malley
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00146 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Pere, Luis) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Case Opening Notice Social Security (Form Attached)
Mon 04/15 12:56 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED.The defendant shall have up to and including 6/14/2024 to enter an appearance and answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint as outlined in Rule 4 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 12:28 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/15/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
notice
Notice to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 12:57 PM
NOTICE to Parties of Right to Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Parties who elect to consent must complete the Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form within 14 days. Please click here to access the form . Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge due by 4/29/2024. (Hill, Cherelle) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 10:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Depina. (Maguire, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Fri 04/12 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Carlos Depina.(Maguire, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/12 11:03 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle) |
||
misc
Corrective Docket Entry
Fri 04/12 11:05 AM
CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding:1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Hill, Cherelle) |