Byron et al v. Stiiizy, Inc.
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Beatty |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01082 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Stiiizy, Inc.
2001 S. Alameda Street
Los Angeles, CA 90058 |
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Byron
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flannery, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 9:05 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Warren on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (djw) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 4:14 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexandra Warren $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5369210 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Warren, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/17 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Stiiizy, Inc. served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. (Boyer, Jamie) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Stiiizy, Inc. Original sent to attorney on file for service. (djw) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment
Fri 04/12 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 3:24-cv-01082-MAB. Consent due by 5/3/2024 (djw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 1:54 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Taylor Berry identifying Other Affiliate Taylor Berry for Taylor Berry. (Boyer, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 1:52 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Taylor Byron identifying Other Affiliate Taylor Byron for Taylor Byron. (Boyer, Jamie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5364420.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Boyer, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |