USA v. MARTE NOLASCO
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Julia E Kobick |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-91190 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 10:10 AM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ORDER entered. Order of Continuance and Excludable Delay from 4/19/2024 to 6/18/2024. (Currie, Haley) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Mon 04/15 10:09 AM
District Judge Julia E. Kobick: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting1 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to June 18, 2024 (Currie, Haley) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 9:34 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Fri 04/12 2:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to June 18, 2024 Responses due by 4/26/2024 (Balakrishna, Annapurna) |