Jensen et al v. Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. et al
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Brian C Buescher |
Referred: | Michael D Nelson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00129 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
MD Nick L. Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Radiologic Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Nebraska Methodist Hospital
|
|
Plaintiff
Jarel J. Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shari L. Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Mon 04/29 9:08 AM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, Defendants, Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. d/b/a Methodist Health System and The Nebraska Methodist Hospital, shall have an extension of time to June 12, 2024, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Fri 04/26 1:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital.(Welch, David) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital (Welch, David) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., Nick L. Nelson, Radiologic Center, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Fri 04/12 2:40 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Requested
Fri 04/12 1:28 PM
Summons Requested as to The Nebraska Methodist Hospital regarding Complaint1 . (Cullan, Patrick) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Fri 04/12 1:27 PM
Summons Requested as to Radiologic Center, Inc. regarding Complaint1 . (Cullan, Patrick) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Fri 04/12 1:26 PM
Summons Requested as to Nebraska Methodist Health System regarding Complaint1 . (Cullan, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Requested
Fri 04/12 1:25 PM
Summons Requested as to Nick L. Nelson MD regarding Complaint1 . (Cullan, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5068555), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Shari L. Jensen, Jarel J. Jensen(Cullan, Patrick) |