Che v. Jaddou et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02793 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
RENA CUTLIP-MASON
|
|
Defendant
Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
USCIS Texas Service Center 6046 N Belt Line Rd
Irving, TX 75038 |
|
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Plaintiff
Yan Chen Che
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 04/17 6:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yanchen Che..(Li, Guofeng) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Rena Cutlip-Mason..(jgo) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 3:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security, RENA CUTLIP-MASON, Director of USCIS Humanitarian Affairs Branch, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yanchen Che..(Li, Guofeng) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Mon 04/15 2:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Guofeng Li. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RENA CUTLIP-MASON, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Yan Chen Che. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 2:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Guofeng Li. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Cause of Action code 28:2201an Declaratory Judgment (aliens and nationality); Nature of Suit code 890 (Other Statutory Actions). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331 Fed. Question; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 465 (Other Immigration Actions). (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 2:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 2:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 2:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 2:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Guofeng Li to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons.The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney information section of Summons Form omitted; Plaintiff party name error listed on Summons Caption; Defendant party name listed does not correspond exactly to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 4:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security, RENA CUTLIP-MASON, Director of USCIS Humanitarian Affairs Branch, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yan Chen Che..(Li, Guofeng) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 4:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Li, Guofeng) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against RENA CUTLIP-MASON, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29213111)Document filed by Yan Chen Che..(Li, Guofeng) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Decision Denying Parol Yanchen Che (A095 834 870), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Decision of Consulate denying application for immigration visa, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. I-131 Application for Travel Document and Expedite Request |