WENDY ARIANA SPENCE v. YEADON BOROUGH et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald J Pappert |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01530 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
JANE DOE
EMS Employee of Trinity Health Mid-Atlantic Medical Group 1500 LANSDOWNE AVENUE
DARBY, PA 19023 |
|
Defendant
ANTHONY JOHNSON
Individually and through his official capacity, Yeadon Borough Police Officer 600 CHURCH LANE
YEADON, PA 19050 |
|
Defendant
LYLE KUNKLE
Individually and as an employee of Trinity Health Mid-Atlantic Medical Group 1500 LANSDOWNE AVENUE
DARBY, PA 19023 |
|
Defendant
DANIELLE PETTYJOHN
Individually and through her official capacity, Yeadon Borough Police Officer 600 CHURCH LANE
YEADON, PA 19050 |
|
Defendant
TRINITY HEALTH MID-ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP
1500 LANSDOWNE AVENUE
DARBY, PA 19023 |
|
Defendant
ROBERT WELLBROCK
Individually and through his official capacity, Yeadon Borough Police Officer 600 CHURCH LANE
YEADON, PA 19050 |
|
Defendant
SOLOMON WHITE
Individually and through his official capacity, Firefighter Yeadon Borough 600 CHURCH LANE
YEADON, PA 19050 |
|
Defendant
YEADON BOROUGH
600 CHURCH LANE
YEADON, PA 19050 |
|
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF WENDY ARIANA SPENCE
BROOKHAVEN, PA 19015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Bond on behalf of JANE DOE, LYLE KUNKLE, TRINITY HEALTH MID-ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP (Bond, Andrew) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/29 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY BURKE on behalf of JANE DOE, LYLE KUNKLE, TRINITY HEALTH MID-ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BURKE, TIMOTHY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/23 2:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael Duffy re: served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant, Trinity Health Mid-Atlantic Medical Group by Hand Delivery on 4/15/2024 (LAROSA, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 9:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by YEADON BOROUGH. YEADON BOROUGH waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 9:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SOLOMON WHITE. SOLOMON WHITE waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 9:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY JOHNSON. ANTHONY JOHNSON waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DANIELLE PETTYJOHN. DANIELLE PETTYJOHN waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT WELLBROCK. ROBERT WELLBROCK waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS on behalf of ANTHONY JOHNSON, DANIELLE PETTYJOHN, ROBERT WELLBROCK, SOLOMON WHITE, YEADON BOROUGH with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 1:57 PM
NOTICE by ESTATE OF WENDY ARIANA SPENCE re1 Complaint (Attorney) Completed Designation Form (LAROSA, MICHAEL) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to ANTHONY JOHNSON, LYLE KUNKLE, DANIELLE PETTYJOHN, TRINITY HEALTH MID-ATLANTIC MEDICAL GROUP, ROBERT WELLBROCK, SOLOMON WHITE, YEADON BOROUGH. Forwarded To: Michael D. LaRosa on 4/15/24 (fdc) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 04/12 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17395742.), filed by ESTATE OF WENDY ARIANA SPENCE.(LAROSA, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Fri 04/12 3:20 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No question needs to be answered. (sbt) |