Garcia (PS) v. Bell
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00987 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Jason M. Bell
|
|
Plaintiff
Christina Garcia
1535 North High Street
Denver, CO 80218 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 4:44 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order , the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.2 ) is denied with leave to file as a completed form, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/15/2024. (ccuen, ) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/12 4:56 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 4:53 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Christina Garcia. (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Jason M. Bell, filed by Christina Garcia. (blaws) |