MERKIN v. MADISON INVESTMENTS, LLC et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
BARMAK MADANI
|
|
Defendant
SIAMAK MADANI
|
|
Defendant
MADISON INVESTMENTS, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ABRAHAM MERKIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 04/18 1:41 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ABRAHAM MERKIN (Willner, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
order
.Order Standing Order
Thu 04/18 9:37 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/18/2024. (lcrdm3) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 4:41 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BARMAK MADANI, SIAMAK MADANI, MADISON INVESTMENTS, LLC.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 4:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata
Mon 04/15 9:53 AM
ERRATA by ABRAHAM MERKIN.(Willner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Errata Notice of Errata | ||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Mon 04/15 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10825317) filed by ABRAHAM MERKIN.(Willner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons to Madison Investments, LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons to Siamak Madani, | ||
Att: 6 Summons to Barmak Madani |