Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 0:24-cv-60588
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Thu 12/05 2:12 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Appeal Filing Fee received on 12/5/2024 in the amount of $ 605.00, receipt number FLS295595. (vt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 appeal Transcript Order Form - Court (PART I) Tue 12/03 3:49 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Michael Mizrachy re13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Mizrachy. No Transcript Requested. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Thu 11/21 4:31 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re13 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Mizrachy. Date received by USCA: 11/19/2024. USCA Case Number: 24-13806 B. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
14 14 notice Clerk's Notice (Other) with Optional Ad Hoc NEF Tue 11/19 4:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Michael Mizrachy re13 Notice of Appeal. (jgo)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 11/19 4:38 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal,and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re13 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 11/19 4:37 PM
Notice of Appeal re11 Order on Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), by Michael Mizrachy. Filing Fee: Not Paid. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] . (No Certificate of Appealability shall issue per DE11 Order.) (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
12 12 order Judgment Thu 11/07 3:56 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Michael Mizrachy. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 10 pgs order Order on Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Tue 11/05 4:48 PM
ORDER DENYING 28 U.S.C. § 2255 MOTION TO VACATE re1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Michael Mizrachy. No Certificate of Appealability shall issue. Final Judgment will issue in a separate order. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
10 10 misc Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 07/26 2:17 PM
REPLY to Government's Response in Opposition re7 Response to Order to Show Cause by Michael Mizrachy.(nwn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 07/25 12:32 PM
CLERK NOTICE of Compliance: copy of Order ECF No. 8 mailed out to the Movant at Coleman Low - FCI (kma)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/25 12:21 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting6 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Response. Defendant may file a Reply to the Government's Response7 no later than August 29, 2024.( Replies due by 8/29/2024.). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (kma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 06/27 10:57 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America.(Latta, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcripts Sentencing Hearing,
Att: 2 Transcripts Change of Plea Hearing
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Thu 06/27 10:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response In Opposition to Movant's Motion to Vacate Out of Time by United States of America. (Latta, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
5 5 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 06/24 3:14 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Michael Mizrachy. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/17 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Latta on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Brooke Latta added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Latta, Brooke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/16 1:51 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Michael Mizrachy. Government Memorandum of Fact and Law to Show Cause Response due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 04/12 3:29 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Fri 04/12 3:24 PM
MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 0:21-cr-60079-AMC), filed by Michael Mizrachy.(kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Exhibit A