Linfo IP, LLC v. Trustpilot, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02796 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Trustpilot, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Linfo IP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/25 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/25/2024) (tg) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Declined as Not Related
Mon 04/22 4:20 PM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:24-cv-01163-JLR and declined by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon and returned to wheel for assignment. (vba) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 04/22 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/22 4:22 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Thu 04/18 1:45 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:24-cv-1163. Document filed by Linfo IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 04/15 2:33 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 2:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trustpilot, Inc.. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David John Hoffman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David John Hoffman to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Related Case Number information not reflected on Form. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement
Mon 04/15 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney David John Hoffman, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 2:29 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 2:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Mon 04/15 2:30 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jennifer L. Rochon as possibly related to 1:24-cv-01163-JLR. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Notice of Related Cases. Document filed by Linfo IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
5 | 5
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 3:52 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Linfo IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 3:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TrustPilot, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Linfo IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Fri 04/12 3:47 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 3:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Trustpilot, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29213610)Document filed by Linfo IP, LLC..(Hoffman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |