Olin Corporation v. Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Victor Marrero |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02797 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Olin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 04/17 2:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Kenisha Gross, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Olin Corporation..(Pellis, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 12:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group Inc. for Olin Corporation. Document filed by Olin Corporation..(Pellis, Joseph) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 11:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Joseph Louis Pellis to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph E. Hopkins on behalf of Olin Corporation..(Hopkins, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 11:10 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 11:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Louis Pellis, II. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $60,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 11:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 11:05 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 11:05 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Olin Corporation..(Pellis, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 3:50 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Olin Corporation..(Pellis, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pellis, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Huntsman Ethyleneamines LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29213657)Document filed by Olin Corporation..(Pellis, Joseph) |