Soohoo et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02798 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kwok Soohoo
|
|
Plaintiff
Pik Soohoo
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Cornachio, III on behalf of Kwok Soohoo, Pik Soohoo..(Cornachio, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 04/24 12:06 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF No. 6. Counsel for Plaintiff shall promptly file a notice of appearance. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:6 CONSENT MOTION for Confidentiality stipulation to be so-ordered . CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order stipulation to be so-ordered filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/24/2024) (mml) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Case Management Plan
Wed 04/24 9:51 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc....(Adler, Martin) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Confidentiality Protective Order
Wed 04/24 9:44 AM
CONSENT MOTION for Confidentiality stipulation to be so-ordered ., CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order stipulation to be so-ordered . Document filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc....(Adler, Martin) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/16 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE Initial Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 12:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (via telephone).Toll-Free Tele-conference call-in number: (877) 336 - 1839. Access code: 1047966#. (jca) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 11:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Martin M. Adler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Dollar Demand 750,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 ; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 750,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 11:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 11:28 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 11:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 4:00 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... Document filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc....(Adler, Martin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 04/12 3:55 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc...(Adler, Martin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Adler, Martin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, County of WESTCHESTER. Case Number: 65693/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29213772).Document filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc....(Adler, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit S&C, AOS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit ANSWER, DEMAND, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit RESPONSE 3017C |