American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. v. Pirch, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Todd W Robinson |
Referred: | Michelle M Pettit |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00672 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:09 PM PDT |
Defendant
Pirch, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Mon 04/22 9:36 AM
ORDER denying4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/22/2024. (sjt) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Motions Submitted
Wed 04/17 5:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Todd W. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2024 re4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. The motion is taken under submission; written order to follow. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Newman, Darryl Laddin (t)). (no document attached) (jao) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 04/17 9:03 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/17/2024. (sjt) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 9:20 PM
NOTICE Regarding Service of Order Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. re9 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Lyman, Kerri) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear
Mon 04/15 6:21 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Lyman, Kerri) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. re4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law ,9 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings(Lyman, Kerri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/15 12:25 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing And Briefing Schedule On Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction (ECF No.4 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/15/2024.(alns) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Mon 04/15 11:28 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Frank N. White, re5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/15/2024.(rmc) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Mon 04/15 11:27 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Darryl Scott Laddin, re6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/15/2024.(rmc) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Sat 04/13 3:18 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18757717.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Laddin, Darryl) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Sat 04/13 2:40 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18757714.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (White, Frank) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 04/12 3:42 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc..(Lyman, Kerri)(sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Oguz Ozsahin in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Kerri A. Lyman Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 83.3(g) in Connection with Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2 to Declaration of Kerri A. Lyman, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Declaration of Stephen J. Newman in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Stephen J. Newman | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Fri 04/12 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Lyman, Kerri) (sjt) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 1:27 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Pirch, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18755364.), filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-672-TWR-MMP. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Lyman, Kerri A.)(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit A and B |