Guevara Arenas v. MCCLEARY
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00699 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
MICHAEL J MCCLEARY
|
|
Plaintiff
Luis Enrique Guevara Arenas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/25 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Henye S. Perez on behalf of Luis Enrique Guevara Arenas. Lead Counsel: Henye S. Perez. (Perez, Henye) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Mon 04/15 1:19 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship Immigration Services. (EVK) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/15 1:11 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Henye S. Perez of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
3 | 3
order
Interested Persons Order
Mon 04/15 10:59 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/15/2024. (KM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 8:19 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-699-PGB-LHP. (ARL) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21979181) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Perez, Henye) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |