Reid v. Campbell
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Mckinley, Jr |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 11:47 AM
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE Signed (EBOC) by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 4/16/2024 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED the Christian County Jail shall collect the $350.00 filing fee from Plaintiff's prison trust account. The Clerk of Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (Inmate No. 957257); Finance USDC WDKY; CCJ, Attn: Inmate Accounts, 410 W. Seventh St., Hopkinsville, KY 42240(EAS) |
|
utility
Schedules
Wed 04/17 2:34 PM
Schedules Initial Review due by 8/19/2024. (EAS) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 4:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Shane Reid (EAS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 4:19 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EAS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Wesley Campbell, filed by Michael Shane Reid. (EAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons |