Chappell et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00927 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Parish of Orleans, Civil District COurt, 21-00001 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:10 PM CDT |
Selection Required
Sean Chappell
|
Represented By
|
Selection Required
Amber Farria
|
Represented By
|
Selection Required
Katherine Koeppel
|
|
Selection Required
Peter Koeppel
|
|
Selection Required
Shamrock Enterprises, Inc. of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Remand
Tue 04/30 12:44 PM
First MOTION to Remand by Peter Koeppel. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/30/2024.(Koeppel, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 9:53 AM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shamrock Enterprises, Inc. of Alabama, Amber Farria, Sean Chappell. (lb) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 4:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Parish of Orleans, Civil District COurt, case number 2021-00001 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10484326) filed by Sean Chappell, Amber Farria, Shamrock Enterprises, Inc. of Alabama.Attorney Mark R. Pharr, III added to party Sean Chappell(pty:selreq), Attorney Mark R. Pharr, III added to party Amber Farria(pty:selreq), Attorney Mark R. Pharr, III added to party Shamrock Enterprises, Inc. of Alabama(pty:selreq).(Pharr, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Index of Pleadings in State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Verification, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit List of Attorneys |