Raymond v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Andrea K Johnstone |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hillsborough County Superior Court, SD, 226-2024-CV00130 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Secord Raymond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Action Required
Tue 04/23 9:19 AM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Required - SECOND NOTICE - re: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Diversity Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Diversity Disclosure Statement has been filed by Bonnie Secord Raymond. Bonnie Secord Raymond must file a Diversity Disclosure Statement using the Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents/Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 4/30/2024.(kad) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hale Yazicioglu Lake on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation Attorney Hale Yazicioglu Lake added to party Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft).(Lake, Hale) |
|
4 | 4
misc
State Court Record
Thu 04/18 12:15 PM
Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2024-CV-00130, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Seeley, Donald) |
|
notice
Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/18 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/9/2024. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 4:24 PM
Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Seeley, Donald) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Action Required
Mon 04/15 10:23 AM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Required re: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Diversity Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Diversity Disclosure Statements have been filed. Bonnie Secord Raymond and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation must file a Diveristy Disclosure Statement using the Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents/Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 4/22/2024.(kad) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Magistrate Judge Assignment
Fri 04/12 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 6/3/2024.(ed) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Fri 04/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Superior Court, case number 226-2024-CV-00130 (filing fee $405, receipt number ANHDC-2498791) filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, as Trustee for the Benefit of the Freddie Mac Seasonal Loans Structured Transaction Trust, Series 2021-2. Answer Follow Up on 5/3/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/26/2024.(Seeley, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 04/12 4:21 PM
Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-101-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) |
||
notice
Notice - ECF
Fri 04/12 4:23 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website[LINK:HERE] .(ed) |