Jaber v. ODDO et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Maureen P Kelly |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00079 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Petitioner
Ismail Yousef Jaber
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
MERRICK B. GARLAND
|
|
Respondent
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
|
|
Respondent
LEONARD ODDO
|
|
Respondent
CAMMILLA WAMSLEY
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Thu 04/25 12:30 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ISMAIL YOUSEF JABER. (Rose, Ian) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Thu 04/25 11:16 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Order to Show Cause, as stated herein. Respondents shall answer or otherwise respond to the1 Petition on or before May 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/25/2024. (dad) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 04/25 11:17 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MERRICK B. GARLAND on 5/16/2024; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS on 5/16/2024; LEONARD ODDO on 5/16/2024; CAMMILLA WAMSLEY on 5/16/2024 (dad) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Wed 04/24 12:45 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, LEONARD ODDO, CAMMILLA WAMSLEY. (Fischer, Adam) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, LEONARD ODDO, CAMMILLA WAMSLEY. (Fischer, Adam) |
|
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Sun 04/21 8:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Habeas Petition and Exhibits served on Respondents on April 16-17, 2024, filed by ISMAIL YOUSEF JABER. (Rose, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Certified Mail and Delivery Confirmation | ||
2 | 2
motion
Show Cause
Sun 04/21 7:53 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ISMAIL YOUSEF JABER. (Rose, Ian) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Credit Card Required)
Fri 04/12 4:19 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number APAWDC-8213999), filed by Ismail Yousef Jaber. (Rose, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Declaration of Ismail Yousef Jaber, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Arrest Report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, IJ Removal Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, Parole Docs, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, ICE Detainee Transfer Form, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, NTA, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, Order Withdrawing Bond Request, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, ICE Warning, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, Travel Doc Requests Jan 2024, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, ICE Emails, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, ICE Notice, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, Travel Doc Requests Feb 2024, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, Travel Doc Requests March 2024, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, Travel Doc Request April 2024, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, UNHCR-Canada Report on Entry to Palestine | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/15 11:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jd) |