Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Referred: Brian Mckay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00909
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Case in other court:191st District Court, Dallas County, DC-24-01440
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 7:21 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
EverBank NA
Represented By
Thomas William White, Jr
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
R Dwayne Danner
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karim Bryant
Represented By
Kenneth Stuart Harter
Law Offices Of Kenneth S Harter
contact info
Defendant
EverBank NA
Represented By
Thomas William White, Jr
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
R Dwayne Danner
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Karim Bryant
Represented By
Kenneth Stuart Harter
Law Offices Of Kenneth S Harter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Fri 02/21 11:55 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified that this case has settled. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers within 60 days from the date of this order. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/21/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/21 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by EverBank NA (Davis, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Thu 12/26 2:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by EverBank NA re:22 MOTION for Leave to File file motion for summary judgment after deadline (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
23 23 respm Reply Mon 12/23 2:57 PM
REPLY filed by EverBank NA re:19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
22 22 motion Leave to File Thu 12/12 11:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to File file motion for summary judgment after deadline filed by Karim Bryant with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Harter, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 07, 2024
21 21 respm Response/Objection Sat 12/07 10:32 AM
RESPONSE filed by Karim Bryant re:19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Harter, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
20 20 respm Appendix in Support Fri 11/22 2:34 PM
Appendix in Support filed by EverBank NA re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
19 19 motion Judgment Fri 11/22 2:32 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by EverBank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 23, 2024
18 18 14 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/23 3:18 PM
Special Order No. 3-354: Effective August 23, 2024, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Magistrate Judge Brian McKay and shall henceforth carry the suffix letters BW. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-354. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge David C. Godbey on 8/23/2024) (mms)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
17 17 trial Designation of Experts Fri 08/16 4:08 PM
Designation of Experts by EverBank NA. (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 08/01 4:55 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Karim Bryant. Related document:15 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, (Harter, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
15 15 cmp Counterclaim Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 06/26 4:30 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by EverBank NA, COUNTERCLAIM against Karim Bryant filed by EverBank NA (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) A-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) A-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) A-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) A-7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) A-8,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) A-9
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 06/25 3:31 PM
ORDER granting13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Including Counterclaims. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have until seven days from the date of the entry of this order to file an amended answer that includes Defendant's Counterclaims against Plaintiff Karim Bryant. (The requesting party must file the document with the clerk.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/25/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Tue 06/25 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Including Counterclaims against Karim Bryant filed by EverBank NA (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List) Fri 05/24 3:07 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings for Plaintiff due by 6/14/2024 and for Defendant due by 6/28/2024. Discovery due by 10/25/2024. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 6/14/2024 and for Defendant due by 6/28/2024. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/14/2025. Motions due by 11/22/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/24/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 05/24 8:35 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT purusant to [Doc. No. 6] filed by EverBank NA. (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 misc Supplemental Document Wed 04/24 11:26 AM
Supplemental Document by EverBank NA as to5 Order,1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Def's Supplement to Notice of Removal) . (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 12:05 PM
STANDING ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR HEARINGS AND ORAL ARGUMENTS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 12:03 PM
STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
7 7 24 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 12:02 PM
STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Status Report Order Fri 04/19 12:00 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Plaintiffs counsel and Defendants counsel shall confer in person or by telephone not later than 5/3/2024. Status Report due by 5/24/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 11:58 AM
ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF STATE COURT NOTICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/19/2024) (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 misc Court Request For Recusal Wed 04/17 9:48 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Karen Gren Scholer recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:24-CV-0909-K. (frw)
Related: [-]
utility MREF Case Referral (Public Entry) Wed 04/17 10:53 AM
Set MREF referral to Magistrate Judge Horan. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
3 3 qcref Scholer Mon 04/15 12:45 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 04/12 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EverBank, N.A., formerly known as TIAA, FSB. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/12 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by EverBank, N.A., formerly known as TIAA, FSB. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14538645) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (White, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet Supplement