Dunsing v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Gleason |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00085 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | State of Alaska, Third Judicial District, 3AN-2405013 CI |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 2:07 PM AKDT |
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Dunsing
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM AKDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/16 3:11 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER : The Court has reviewed and APPROVES the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal of Uber Technologies, Inc. and Remand at Docket3 . Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. is DISMISSED with prejudice from this action, each side to bear its own costs and fees. This matter is REMANDED to state court. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
Mon 04/15 9:25 AM
ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Clerks Notice
Mon 04/15 9:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignment, this case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Sharon L. Gleason. Please use the following case number for all future filings: 3:24-cv-00085-SLG. (PXS, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Stipulation
Mon 04/15 8:55 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Dismissal of Uber with Prejudice & Remand by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Felder, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Dismissal of Uber & Remand | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 8:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Felder, Brian) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Sun 04/14 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. from District Court of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-2405013CI. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AAKDC-3591994), filed by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Felder, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |