Alexander et al v. The University of Kentucky et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen K Caldwell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 - Sex Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 6:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mitchell S. Barnhart
|
|
Defendant
Gary Conelly
|
|
Defendant
Lars Palsberg Jorgensen
|
|
Defendant
The University of Kentucky
|
|
Plaintiff
Briggs Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan A. Bonanni on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bonanni, Megan) |
|
9 | 9
respoth
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Briggs Alexander, Jane Doe. (Robinson-Holmes, Channing) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 12:48 PM
ORDER: Pla's6 Motion for Megan A. Bonanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Megan A. Bonanni is admitted pro hac vice in this particular civil action for all allowable purposes as of the day of entry of this Order, and until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/24/2024. (DC) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 12:45 PM
ORDER: Pla's5 Motion for Channing Robinson-Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. Channing Robinson-Holmes is admitted pro hac vice in this particular civil action for all allowable purposes as of the day of entry of this Order, and until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/24/2024. (DC) |
|
misc
Bar Status Check
Wed 04/24 10:14 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Megan A. Bonanni, Channing Robinson-Holmes re6 MOTION for Megan A. Bonanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice,5 MOTION for Channing Robinson-Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(DC) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 04/24 10:15 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re6 MOTION for Megan A. Bonanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice,5 MOTION for Channing Robinson-Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (DC) |
||
notice
Notice for Attorney to Request E-Filing Privileges
Wed 04/24 12:51 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Channing Robinson-Holmes & Megan A. Bonanni: re7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349.(DC) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 4:26 PM
MOTION for Megan A. Bonanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Briggs Alexander, Jane Doe ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5821256)(Whittaker, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 3:48 PM
MOTION for Channing Robinson-Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Briggs Alexander, Jane Doe ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5821151)(Whittaker, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit and Application, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Fri 04/12 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Mitchell S. Barnhart, Gary Conelly, Lars Palsberg Jorgensen, The University of Kentucky and returned to counsel electronically for service.(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
notice
Attorney Notice
Fri 04/12 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Megan A. Bonanni and Channing Robinson-Holmes by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 LR 83.1 & 83.2 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5813979), filed by Briggs Alexander, Jane Doe.(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons UK, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Jorgensen, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Barnhart, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Conelly | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Fri 04/12 4:55 PM
Conflict Check run. (KMP) |