Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:24-cv-00450
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Keli Network, Inc.
Represented By
Robb S. Harvey
Waller, Lansden, Dortch & Davis, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
SocialCoaster, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob T. Clabo
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Lauren M. Spahn
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Jay Scott Bowen
Buchalter, PC
contact info

GPO Mar 04 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/3/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
41 41 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 1:26 PM
Summons issued as to Blue Foxes, SAS. (kc) (Main Document 41 replaced on 5/7/2025) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 05/06 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Amended Summons to be Issued as to Blue Foxes in re39 . Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Clabo, Jacob) Modified on 5/6/2025 (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Mon 05/05 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Blue Foxes. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/29 3:36 PM
ORDER granting34 Joint MOTION For Extension of Pleading Deadlines and to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is set on July 18, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/29/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/29 3:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Foxes, SAS, Keli Network, Inc., filed by SocialCoaster, Inc..(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Schedule of BVIRAL Videos re JellySmack,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Schedule of BVIRAL Videos of Blue Foxes,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Exemplar ELA,
Att: 4 Exhibit Email Exchange between Burdon and JellySmack Rep 11-2023
36 36 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/29 3:19 PM
ORDER granting35 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/29/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/29 3:41 PM
Set Hearing per Order38 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 7/18/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
35 35 motion Amend/Correct Mon 04/28 3:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by SocialCoaster, Inc..(Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - [First Amended Complaint] - Schedule of BVIRAL Videos re JellySmack,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - [First Amended Complaint] - Schedule of BVIRAL Videos re Blue Foxes,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - [First Amended Complaint] - Exemplar ELA,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - [First Amended Complaint] - Email Exchange between Burdon and JellySmack Rep - 11.2023
34 34 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/28 3:14 PM
Interim MOTION For Extension of Pleading Deadlines and to Reset Initial Case Management Conference by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/25 9:34 AM
Set Hearing per Order33 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 5/2/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 9:32 AM
ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on May 2, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/20/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/07 1:26 PM
ORDER granting31 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer SocialCoaster, Inc. answer due 4/25/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/7/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/06 9:09 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/04 8:40 AM
ORDER denying15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/3/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
29 29 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Tue 03/04 8:38 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/3/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 01/10 10:42 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Lucas A. Davidson admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas A. Davidson on behalf of SocialCoaster, Inc. (Davidson, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/11 1:43 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 09/11 8:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order 176, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED for all purposes to Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr., as it is related to an earlier-filed case assigned to him. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 08/28 3:18 PM
ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss15 , it hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 16, 2024 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
24 24 respoth Reply Fri 08/23 4:37 PM
REPLY filed by SocialCoaster, Inc. re15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Keli Network, Inc..(Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Exhibit A [Sur-Reply] - Declaration of Jonathan Burdon,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] - BVIRAL to Jellysmack - Email re Notice of Rights - 2023.11.01,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] - BVIRAL to Jellysmack - Email re Notice of Rights - 2023.07.06,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] - BVIRAL to Jellysmack - Email re Notice of Rights - 2024.01.17,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] - BVIRAL to Jellysmack - Email re Notice of Rights - 2022.08.02,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] BVIRAL to Jellysmack - Email re Super Tall Baby Dispute - 2023.10.25,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] BVIRAL DCMA Takedown Notice re Super Tall Baby - 2024.05.29,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] Posted Even After Lawsuit,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 [Declaration of Jonathan Burdon] Jellysmack - Communications re Non-Exclusive Licenses
Monday, August 19, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 08/19 3:01 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/19/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
22 22 motion Leave Fri 08/16 3:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Leave to File a Sur-Reply by SocialCoaster, Inc.. (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 08/12 11:56 AM
ORDER granting19 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 08/09 3:07 PM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties or, in the Alternative to Require Plaintiff to Join Creators filed by Keli Network, Inc..(Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Supplemental Declaration of Robin Sabban,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - to Supplemental Declaration of Robin Sabban
19 19 motion File Excess Pages Fri 08/09 3:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Reply Brief by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 08/06 9:35 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob T. Clabo admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/02 6:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties or, in the Alternative to Require Plaintiff to Join Creators filed by SocialCoaster, Inc.. (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob T. Clabo on behalf of SocialCoaster, Inc. (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 22 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 07/19 3:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties or, in the Alternative to Require Plaintiff to Join Creators filed by Keli Network, Inc. .(Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robin Sabban,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Copyright Registrations,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Deed to 650 Holt Run
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 07/19 3:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties or, in the Alternative to Require Plaintiff to Join Creators by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
14 14 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 12:38 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sun 06/02 1:46 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Keli Network, Inc. answer due 7/19/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/31/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/31 11:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 05/07 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jacob T. Clabo (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/02 11:14 AM
ORDER:9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to1 Complaint is GRANTED. Keli Network, Inc. answer due 6/10/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/01 4:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Keli Network, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/19 2:16 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by SocialCoaster, Inc.. Keli Network, Inc. served on 4/18/2024. (Clabo, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 04/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2024 at 04:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 4:41 PM
Summons issued as to Keli Network, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/12 2:28 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SocialCoaster, Inc. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Keli Network, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4056150), filed by SocialCoaster, Inc.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Infringement Summary,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - BVIRAL Exclusive Agreement,
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 04/12 4:47 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jay Scott Bowen, Jacob T. Clabo admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]