NY Medical Health Care, P.C.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jil Mazer-Marino |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41578 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
NY Medical Health Care, P.C.
6902 Austin St Fl 2
Forest Hills, NY 11375-4250 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Mon 04/29 3:13 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 333 . Signed on 4/29/2024. The Court will hold a telephonic or video hearing before the Honorable Jil Mazer-Marino at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201 on May 9, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. to determine whether the appointment of a health care ombudsman is appropriate. (dnb) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 04/24 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew G Roseman on behalf of Webster Bank (Roseman, Matthew) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:45 AM
Statement Corporate Dislcosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:44 AM
Statement Corporate Resolution Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:43 AM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:42 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:34 AM
Statement List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Statement
Wed 04/24 11:33 AM
Statement Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207)
Wed 04/24 11:31 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum)
Wed 04/24 11:31 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Wed 04/24 11:30 AM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
Wed 04/24 11:29 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 04/24 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Melissa A Pena on behalf of 6092 Austin St Lender, LLC (Pena, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/23 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by William C Heuer on behalf of The SGJ 2015 Irrevocable Trust and Joseph Golyan, individually and as trustee of the Trust (Heuer, William) |
|
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 04/22 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 04/19 1:04 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 4/19/2024 Status hearing to be held on 5/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (tml) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 04/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman
Wed 04/17 7:15 AM
Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman (nwh) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee
Mon 04/15 1:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-2553, Participant Code 1576337, Enter # sign. (Khodorovsky, Nazar) |
|
court
Case Related to a Chapter 11
Mon 04/15 7:46 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-41580 ess, Sinai North Shore Medical Associates, P.L.L.C. (nwh) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Mon 04/15 10:11 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/12/2024.Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/15/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) due by 4/15/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1073-3 due by 4/15/2024. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 4/19/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 4/19/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 4/19/2024. Small Business Tax Return due by 4/19/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/26/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/26/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/26/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/26/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/26/2024. (nop) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Verification of List of Creditors
Fri 04/12 4:50 PM
Verification of List of Creditors Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
3 | 3
misc
List of Creditors
Fri 04/12 4:50 PM
List of Creditors Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1
Fri 04/12 4:21 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. (Berger, Heath) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 04/12 4:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Heath S Berger on behalf of NY Medical Health Care, P.C. Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 10/9/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 10/9/2024. (Berger, Heath) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Fri 04/12 4:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-41578 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22542730. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman
Wed 04/17 7:11 AM
Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman due by 5/17/2024 (nwh) |