Evans v. Shellabarger
Colorado District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00990 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:12 PM MDT |
Defendant
Connor Shellabarger
6530 Coldwater Dr
Parker, CO 80134 |
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Y Evans
1036 South Mackon Street
Aurora, CO 80012 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Tue 04/16 10:41 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Administrative Notice. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Administrative Notice
Mon 04/15 9:32 AM
Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |