14
|
|
14
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Fri 05/03 11:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Gregory Van Wyk waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024; Gregory (I) Van Wyk waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Eagle County Board of Commissioners served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Dan Loya served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Eagle County Sheriff's Office served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Andrew Vigil served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Andrew (I) Vigil served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Gregory Van Wyk served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Gregory (I) Van Wyk served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. James Van Beek served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; James (I) Van Beek served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 05/02 12:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Anthony Valdez served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Anthony (I) Valdez served on 4/29/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 04/29 11:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David (I) Lockhart. Balmore Herrera waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (Walsh, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 9:20 AM
SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/23 1:41 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to SHERIFF JAMES VAN BEEK, CAPTAIN GREGORY VAN WYK, UNDERSHERIFF DAN LOYA, DEPUTY ANTHONY VALDEZ, DEPUTY ANDREW VIGIL, AVON POLICE OFFICER BALMORE HERRERA, EAGLE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, and EAGLE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS by Plaintiff David (I) Lockhart.(Steward, John)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Summons ECBC,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons ECSO,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons HERRERA,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons LOYA,
|
| |
Att: 5
Summons VALDEZ,
|
| |
Att: 6
Summons VAN BEEK,
|
| |
Att: 7
Summons VAN WYK,
|
| |
Att: 8
Summons VIGIL
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tue 04/16 8:56 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (ykare, )
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/16 8:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (ykare, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Eagle County Board of Commissioners, Eagle County Sheriff's Office, Balmor Herrera, Dan Loya, Anthony Valdez, James Van Beek, Gregory Van Wyk, Andrew Vigil (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9635880)Attorney John Stanton Steward added to party Estate of Ian David Lockhart(pty:pla), Attorney John Stanton Steward added to party David Lockhart(pty:pla), filed by David Lockhart, Estate of Ian David Lockhart.(Steward, John)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons ECBC,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons ECSO,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons Herrera,
|
| |
Att: 5
Summons Loya,
|
| |
Att: 6
Summons Valdez,
|
| |
Att: 7
Summons Van Beek,
|
| |
Att: 8
Summons Van Wyk,
|
| |
Att: 9
Summons Vigil
|