Handler (PS) v. Waterton Apartments
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00993 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:12 PM MDT |
Defendant
Waterton Apartments
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Handler
1880 Arapahoe Street
Denver, CO 80202 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 2:41 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 26 April 2024. Plaintiff is directed to file, on or before May 27, 2024, an amended an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), to clarify his monthly income sources in Section 1, and to list any expected income for the next month. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.5 ) is denied without prejudice.(cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 3:07 PM
SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 24 April 2024. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. It isFURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved forms, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. (cmadr, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/26 1:43 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned to Judge Addressed to Scott Handler. (angar, ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Administrative Notice
Tue 04/23 10:09 AM
Administrative Notice: Summonses will not be issued - Case is still under initial review (Text Only Entry) (angar, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 10:44 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/17/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/23 10:06 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury and Request for Immediate Injunction, against Waterton Apartments, Shirley(I) Tibbens, Shirley Tibbens, Alyssa(I) Behanna, Alyssa Behanna, filed by Scott Handler.(angar, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
6 | 6
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 04/23 9:44 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Scott Handler. (angar, ) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 9:34 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Scott Handler. (angar, ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Stay
Tue 04/23 9:30 AM
MOTION for an Emergency Stay, by Plaintiff Scott Handler. (angar, ) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/16 10:24 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Waterton Apartments, filed by Scott Handler.(efoga, ) |