10
|
|
10
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 1:57 PM
ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/30/2024. Consent Form due by 6/13/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/20/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2024, at 09:00 AM MDT in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/19 4:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc..(Cusack, William)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Complaint,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B - Decl. of Aubrey Kallenberger (with Exs. A-C)
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/15 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara A. Green on behalf of Will GoodwinAttorney Sara A. Green added to party Will Goodwin(pty:pla) (Green, Sara)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 04/12 4:25 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 04/12 4:24 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon Johnson Controls, Inc. on 3/22/2024 (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Johnson Controls, Inc., filed by Will Goodwin.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Fri 04/12 4:19 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 2:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Cusack, William)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson Controls, Inc. from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2024CV030602. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9635400), filed by Johnson Controls, Inc..(Cusack, William)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - State Court Action - Complaint with Jury Demand,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A - State Court Action - Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit A - State Court Action - Delay Reduction Order,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service,
|
| |
Att: 6
Civil Cover Sheet
|