Wilkins v. The Home Depot
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00263 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 6:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
The Home Depot
|
|
Plaintiff
Virginia B. Wilkins
7106 Michael Lane
Pleasant Valley, MO 64068 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 10:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS1 Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis with respect to her claims against Home Depot. Plaintiff's Complaint is accepted for filing and is deemed filed on the date it was tendered to the Court with the motion. The Clerk of the Court shall forward appropriate process forms to the Plaintiff, and within twenty days, Plaintiff shall return the completed summons and service forms to the Clerk's office showing the address where Home Depot may be served. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and service forms after receiving the necessary information from Plaintiff and deliver same to the United States Marshal for service upon Home Depot. Signed on 4/16/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (A copy of this order and all service of process forms were mailed to Virginia B. Wilkins, 7106 Michael Lane, Pleasant Valley, MO 64068 on 4/16/2024.) (Melvin, Greg) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT against The Home Depot Virginia B. Wilkins. Service due by 7/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Melvin, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Affidavit
Fri 04/12 3:41 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Virginia B. Wilkins. (Woods, Gloria) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 3:40 PM
Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Virginia B. Wilkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/26/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Woods, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-3 |