First Church of the Nazarene of Enid v. Church Mutual Insurance Company SI
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Scott L Palk |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00378 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Garfield County District Court, CJ-24-00043 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 6:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
Church Mutual Insurance Company SI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
First Church of the Nazarene of Enid
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Docket
Wed 05/01 10:26 AM
TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET : Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 5/30/2024. (llg) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Mon 04/29 2:07 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by First Church of the Nazarene of Enid . (Radovcic, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/22 5:37 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew R Schroeder on behalf of First Church of the Nazarene of Enid (Schroeder, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/22 5:34 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Radovcic on behalf of First Church of the Nazarene of Enid (Radovcic, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/19 4:05 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of First Church of the Nazarene of Enid (Shadid, Danny) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Mon 04/15 11:42 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Church Mutual Insurance Company SI . (Wilson, Emily) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Church Mutual Insurance Company SI.(Wilson, Emily) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/15 11:32 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Christian Garrison on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company SI (Garrison, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/15 11:30 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Emily K Wilson on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company SI (Wilson, Emily) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Receipt
Mon 04/15 10:50 AM
Receipt for Money Received from Church Mutual Insurance Company SI in the amount of $405, receipt number 500006510 regarding1 Notice of Removal. Receipt emailed to gperez@bestsharp.com. (ekw) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Garfield County District Court, case number CJ-2024-43 filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company SI.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Sheet (00705887x9F50C), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition (00705882x9F50C), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Summons (00705885x9F50C), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Petition (00705876x9F50C), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance (00705880x9F50C), | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |