Jara v. Regus Management Group LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02206 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Sonoma County Superior Court, 23CV01903 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Bonnie Fisher
|
|
Defendant
Regus Management Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara Jara
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/26 12:59 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 04/26/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 04/26 12:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 12:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sara Jara.. (Fagnani, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 11:45 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Regus Management Group LLC.. (Snider, Christina) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
Mon 04/22 8:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike . (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 04/19 4:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024 . (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/19 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike filed by Regus Management Group LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/30/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Responses due by 5/3/2024. Replies due by 5/10/2024.(Snider, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 04/17 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regus Management Group LLC Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order (Snider, Christina) |
|
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 04/17 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regus Management Group LLC re State Court Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Snider, Christina) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Raymond Fagnani (Fagnani, Bradley) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 9:17 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 7:30 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 4:51 PM
NOTICE by Regus Management Group LLC of Pendency of Other Action (Snider, Christina) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/12 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regus Management Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regus Corporation for Regus Management Group LLC. (Snider, Christina) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/12 4:40 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Regus Management Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regus Corporation for Regus Management Group LLC. (Snider, Christina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV01903. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19317201). Filed by Regus Management Group LLC.(Snider, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (All Documents Filed in State Court), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service |