Flick Intelligence, LLC v. HTC America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02201 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
HTC America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Flick Intelligence, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 9:39 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to HTC America, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/15 9:36 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents Re:5 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Flick Intelligence, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/12 3:44 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Flick Intelligence, LLC (Kalra, Susan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 3:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kalra, Susan) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Fri 04/12 3:10 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (AO-120) (cc: form mailed to register). (Kalra, Susan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 3:08 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Flick Intelligence, LLC . (Kalra, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against HTC America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19316600.). Filed by Flick Intelligence, LLC.(Kalra, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |