Arcturus Home Care LLC
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Henry W Van Eck |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-00905 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 22, 2024 |
Debtor
Arcturus Home Care LLC
512 Market St., Suite 1
Millersburg, PA 17061 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102 |
|
Trustee
Lawrence V. Young
CGA Law Firm (Trustee) 135 North George Street
York, PA 17401 |
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 12:02 AM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Fri 04/12 1:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:24-bk-00905] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11028105, amount $ 338.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 04/12 1:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 338.00 Filed by Jerry A. Philpott on behalf of Arcturus Home Care LLC. (Philpott, Jerry) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Fri 04/12 1:03 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Jerry A. Philpott on behalf of Arcturus Home Care LLC . (Philpott, Jerry) |
|
3 | 3
court
Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 04/12 10:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Young, Lawrence V. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2024 at 01:30 PM - w/Trustee Young join.zoom.us Meeting ID 402 683 1766, passcode 7248498808, Phone 1-267-552-4740. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |