Torres v. Sher Tremonte LLP et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02761 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 04/23 3:26 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey (LIVE) acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:24-cv-05502, filed on 4/23/2024. (rju) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Tue 04/16 11:14 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Jose Torres J-2020-03855 354 Doremus Avenue Newark, NJ 07105. (nb) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 6:05 PM
TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/15/2024) (ate) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 04/22 10:39 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (ate) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Fri 04/12 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 9:39 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jose Torres..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Noam Korati Biale, Anna Maria Estevao, Kimo Peluso, Justin M. Sher, Sher Tremonte LLP, Michael Tremonte. Document filed by Jose Torres..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 9:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |