Cherner v. CF Bankshares Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02812 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Thomas Ash
|
|
Defendant
CF Bankshares Inc.
4960 E. Dublin Granville Rd. Suite 400
Columbus, OH 43081 |
|
Defendant
CFBank, N.A.
4960 E. Dubin Granville Rd. Suite 400
Columbus, OH 43081 |
|
Defendant
Edward Cochran
|
|
Defendant
James Frauenberg II
|
|
Defendant
Robert Hoeweler
|
|
Defendant
Marianne McKinney
|
|
Defendant
Timothy O'Dell
|
|
Defendant
Sundeep Rana
|
|
Defendant
David Royer
|
|
Plaintiff
Dan Cherner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/22 7:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cherner, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Ash, CF Bankshares Inc., CFBank, N.A., Edward Cochran, James Frauenberg II, Robert Hoeweler, Marianne McKinney, Timothy O'Dell, Sundeep Rana, David Royer..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 11:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 11:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 11:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 11:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Cherner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $200,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 11:40 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Cherner to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple citizenships for the defendant were selected. Choose one for the first listed defendant;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/12 9:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CF Bankshares Inc., CFBank N.A., Timothy O'Dell, Robert Hoeweler, Thomas Ash, Edward Cochran, James Frauenberg II, Sundeep Rana, David Royer, Marianne McKinney, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dan Cherner..(Cherner, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 8:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cherner, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 8:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Ash, CF Bankshares Inc., CFBank, N.A., Edward Cochran, James Frauenberg II, Robert Hoeweler, Marianne McKinney, Timothy O'Dell, Sundeep Rana, David Royer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29215542)Document filed by Dan Cherner..(Cherner, Daniel) |