Rangel v. Dividend Finance Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14108 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dividend Finance Inc.
201 N. Franklin Street Suite 3050
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Momentum Solar
115 . Calhoun Street Suite #4
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Plaintiff
Joel Rangel
301 W. Platt St #216
Tampa, FL 33606 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 04/30 9:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Defendant Dividend Finance Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension to Clarify Citizenship. Defendant Dividend Finance Inc. shall file its clarification of citizenship on or before May 6, 2024 . Moving forward, all requests for extensions will be made sufficiently in advance of the deadline at issue. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/30/2024. (mp01) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/29 3:47 PM
Defendant's NOTICE Regarding to Request for Extension of Time to Respond to the Order to Clarify Citizenship by Dividend Finance Inc. re10 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to6 Order, to Clarify Citizenship (Holmes, Brandon) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 04/26 5:33 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to6 Order, to Clarify Citizenship by Dividend Finance Inc..(Holmes, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 12:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Momentum Solar, LLC. (ls) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Fri 04/19 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joel Rangel (Dunivan, Bryant) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/16 1:45 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/16 10:52 AM
ORDER TO CLARIFY CITIZENSHIP. On or before April 26, 2024, Defendant Dividend Finance Inc. shall file a supplement to its notice of removal, with additional evidence/affidavits, supporting the exercise of diversity jurisdiction exist in this case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
5 | 5
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/16 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. ( Removal Status Report due by 5/6/2024.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/15 12:49 PM
Defendant's NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Dividend Finance Inc. (Holmes, Brandon) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 04/15 9:40 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 9:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Fri 04/12 9:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $405.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-17445801, payment transferred from : 24cv14108 filed by Dividend Finance Inc..(Holmes, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 |